Rank | Status | Round | Name | YOB | Gender | Nation | Club | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
23. 3. 2024 - 24. 3. 2024 | Western Cape Provincial I | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | N | KRUGER Pieter Willem | 2007 | M | RSA | Blues Cape Town (RSA) | ||
2 | N | DO O'FILIPE Tiago Luis Vaz | 2006 | M | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | ||
3 | N | RICHARDS Aidan | 2005 | M | RSA | USSK Stellenbosch (RSA) | ||
3 | N | RICHARDS Daniel | 2005 | M | RSA | USSK Stellenbosch (RSA) | ||
18. 3. 2023 - 19. 3. 2023 | Western Cape Provincial | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | N | KRUGER Pieter Willem | 2007 | M | RSA | Blues Cape Town (RSA) | ||
2 | N | RICHARDS Daniel | 2005 | M | RSA | Bishops FC (RSA) | ||
3 | N | RICHARDS Aidan | 2005 | M | RSA | Bishops FC (RSA) | ||
3 | N | SAUNDERS Jack | 2004 | M | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | ||
17. 2. 2018 - 18. 2. 2018 | FWC Cape Town | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | KOMAROV Yuri | 2003 | M | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | |||
2 | HILLEBRAND Darien | 1998 | M | RSA | UCT Cape Town (RSA) | |||
3 | CM REBELO Miguel | 2002 | M | RSA | Blues Cape Town (RSA) | |||
4 | SMITH Findlay Scott | 2000 | M | RSA | Reddam FC (RSA) | |||
25. 2. 2017 - 26. 2. 2017 | FWC Cape Town | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | KIM Terry | 2000 | M | RSA | Bishops FC (RSA) | |||
2 | YANTOLO Phakama | 2000 | F | RSA | Blues Khayelitsha (RSA) | |||
3 | BURGER Mieke | 2001 | F | RSA | Blues Cape Town (RSA) | |||
3 | VAN WYK Marilene | 1999 | F | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | |||
23. 4. 2016 - 24. 4. 2016 | FWC Cape Town | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | COLLINGS Alexander | 1996 | M | RSA | UCT Cape Town (RSA) | |||
2 | KIM Terry | 2000 | M | RSA | Bishops FC (RSA) | |||
3 | LANDMAN Christian | 2001 | M | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | |||
3 | VAN DER MERWE Charl | 1996 | M | RSA | USSK Stellenbosch (RSA) | |||
14. 3. 2015 - 15. 3. 2015 | FWC Cape Town | Cape Town | ||||||||
1 | N | SCHROEDER Adam | 1997 | M | RSA | Cape Fencing Academy (RSA) | ||
2 | N | LEE Soo-Min | 1997 | M | RSA | |||
3 | N | KIM Terry | 2000 | M | RSA | |||
3 | N | LANDMAN Christian | 2001 | M | RSA |